THE CATCUDDLES SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1147971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £132.79k £78.98k £77.46k £87.27k £168.75k
Total expenditure £87.78k £96.07k £92.13k £89.57k £178.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A