Financial history THE JOHN STRUTT MEMORIAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £0 £2.49m £53.70k £49.17k £70.36k
Total expenditure £0 £88.56k £64.51k £78.65k £69.06k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £9.67k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £88.56k N/A N/A N/A