TOXTETH WOMEN'S CENTRE

Charity number: 1147835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carole Adams Trustee 08 April 2014 None on record
Felicity Dobrushi Trustee 10 February 2021 None on record
Brenda Clarke BE Trustee 04 October 2016 None on record
David Williams Chair 28 June 2018 None on record
Hannah Carys Northover Trustee 15 September 2015 None on record