PUDSEY CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 502745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £13.52k £10.69k £4.75k £5.92k £14.97k
Total expenditure £10.59k £10.60k £10.64k £9.84k £8.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k