Accounts and annual returns SWANSEA UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1149941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 14 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 14 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 01 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 08 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 10 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window