Financial history BURNS CAMPS

Charity number: 1148917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £56.77k £64.13k £55.94k £15.71k £4.68k
Total expenditure £64.22k £57.72k £46.12k £64.18k £1.61k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A