Accounts and annual returns BURNS CAMPS

Charity number: 1148917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 04 June 2021 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 27 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 27 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 24 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 24 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 09 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 09 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window