Financial history ROCK OF REFUGE TRIUMPHANT MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1147026
Charity reporting is overdue by 144 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £7.17k £11.46k £6.79k £3.93k £5.72k
Total expenditure £8.29k £8.41k £4.10k £6.60k £7.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A