Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST JOSEPH'S

Charity number: 502759
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 19 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 17 December 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 17 December 2020 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2019 12 February 2020 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 05 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 12 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2017 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 29 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window