Financial history FRIENDS OF ST JOSEPH'S

Charity number: 502759
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £47.58k £37.31k £24.27k £25.11k £4.86k
Total expenditure £42.96k £18.74k £5.53k £54.44k £4.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A