SOUTHPORT SPOTLIGHTS MUSICAL THEATRE SOCIETY

Charity number: 502783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £67.85k £80.47k £80.63k £47.76k £7.55k
Total expenditure £73.38k £81.81k £84.63k £46.12k £10.76k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A