CULTURE CONNECT UK

Charity number: 1149119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2020 16 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2019 02 April 2020 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2018 22 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2017 14 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2016 12 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2016 Not Required