Financial history FRIENDS OF CHANDLERS RIDGE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1147163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £24.07k £16.16k £16.96k £6.18k £10.91k
Total expenditure £22.69k £15.41k £19.76k £11.89k £6.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £200 £300 N/A N/A