Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MICHAELS, TWERTON, BATH

Charity number: 1147405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £215.22k £177.15k £156.32k £155.06k £181.71k
Total expenditure £216.67k £197.52k £176.80k £133.65k £146.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £3.55k N/A £19.89k £22.49k