Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MICHAELS, TWERTON, BATH

Charity number: 1147405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Richard White Chair 22 August 2019
ST PETER'S SUNDAY SCHOOLS AND PARISH ROOM
Received: On time
Qamar Rafiq Trustee 15 May 2022
PAKISTAN INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
Recently registered
Nicola Grizzell Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Richard Eaton Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Iain Kyle Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
KIRSTY PITKIN Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
James Hicks Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Christopher Tatchell Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Julie Lewis Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Chris Turner Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
Rachel Lewis Trustee 18 April 2016
None on record
DILYS MARY SMITH Trustee 16 May 2012
None on record