Financial history Sandwell Aquatics Club

Charity number: 1147581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £92.01k £88.01k £89.28k £99.62k £166.30k
Total expenditure £111.42k £99.41k £91.43k £102.44k £158.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £4.48k