MIDLAND FINE ARTS AND LANGUAGE ACADEMY

Charity number: 1148038
Charity reporting is up to date (49 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 June 2021 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 18 June 2021 49 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 23 June 2020 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 23 June 2020 54 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 09 May 2019 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 09 May 2019 9 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 February 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 March 2017 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required