MIDLAND FINE ARTS AND LANGUAGE ACADEMY

Charity number: 1148038
Charity reporting is up to date (49 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £21.50k £24.73k £32.42k £45.53k £37.51k
Total expenditure £21.50k £23.76k £32.14k £37.98k £35.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A