ABODE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1148628
Charity reporting is overdue by 261 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 261 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 261 days
Annual return 04 April 2019 24 July 2020 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2018 21 July 2020 533 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2017 16 July 2020 893 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2016 24 November 2017 293 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2016 Not Required