ABODE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1148628
Charity reporting is overdue by 226 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 04/04/2014 04/04/2016 04/04/2017 04/04/2018 04/04/2019
Total gross income £8.49k £10.19k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £8.49k £10.19k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A