BOGNOR REGIS FOODBANK

Charity number: 1148187
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.76k £28.39k £36.91k £21.57k £38.21k
Total expenditure £28.53k £30.67k £24.57k £26.42k £27.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.00k £0 N/A £7.50k £5.00k