Trustees Sheffield Flourish

Charity number: 1147334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adelaide Chibanda Trustee 01 March 2019
None on record
Shirin Teifouri Trustee 05 June 2017
None on record
Andrew Hudson Trustee 24 May 2016
None on record
Jane Ferretti Trustee 01 March 2014
None on record
Andrew John Wood Trustee 01 October 2013
SHEFFIELD YOUNG CARERS PROJECT
Received: On time
Nicholas Bax Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
PAM STIRLING Trustee 17 May 2012
THE CHAMPERNOWNE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CHAMPERNOWNE TRUST
Received: On time
BRENDAN JARVIS STONE Trustee 17 May 2012
None on record