Accounts and annual returns LTA TENNIS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1148421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window