Financial history LTA TENNIS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1148421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £628.58k £610.72k £519.00k £8.38m £312.00k
Total expenditure £136.16k £163.08k £798.00k £2.01m £882.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £8.00m N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £628.58k £610.72k £519.00k £385.00k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities -£385.00k £24.00k £703.00k £1.83m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £136.16k £139.08k £95.00k £180.00k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution -£385.00k £0 £703.00k £1.83m N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £136.16k £139.08k £95.00k £66.00k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A