THE HACKNEY FOODBANK

Charity number: 1149896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Feona Daly Cairn Trustee 20 December 2020 None on record
Mark Boisson Trustee 07 April 2021
HACKNEY BLACK ASIAN & MINORITY ETHNIC (BAME) MEN’S HEALTH ORGANISATION Overdue by 668 days
BLACK EQUITY ORGANISATION (BEO) Recently registered
Imogen Rebecca Frances Clark Trustee 06 November 2020
MAKE SPACE FOR GIRLS Recently registered
Susan Josephine Bell Trustee 23 January 2019 None on record
Caroline Obrien Trustee 06 November 2020 None on record
Ian Stephenson Trustee 20 May 2020 None on record
Michael Charles Vaughan Johnson Trustee 20 May 2020 None on record
Nanette Daniels Trustee 17 May 2021 None on record