THE WEST GREEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1147910
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £123.36k £119.32k £116.91k £87.23k £172.84k
Total expenditure £98.02k £101.13k £151.29k £76.18k £197.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A