SKI 2 FREEDOM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1151307
Charity reporting is overdue by 162 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £16.63k £39.93k £17.41k £10.29k £30.00k
Total expenditure £19.34k £55.13k £14.92k £12.31k £27.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A