THE JANE PACKER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1150663
Charity reporting is overdue by 156 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019
Total gross income £40.76k £39.06k £3.36k £2.09k £735
Total expenditure £31.56k £38.19k £1.83k £20.26k £222
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A