Accounts and annual returns PRABASHI

Charity number: 1148232
Charity reporting is overdue by 395 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 30 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 30 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 395 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 395 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2022 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2022 720 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required