Financial history FINISH WELL

Charity number: 1148233
Charity reporting is overdue by 70 days

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2018 06/04/2019 06/04/2020 06/04/2021 06/04/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A