Financial history SAINT PETERS SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1147884
Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £12.14k £11.29k £11.98k £6.79k £8.17k
Total expenditure £17.90k £7.12k £15.76k £8.61k £8.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A