AGE CONCERN ORPINGTON & DISTRICT

Charity number: 1148958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £271.36k £273.74k £292.44k £390.98k £397.54k
Total expenditure £275.30k £297.33k £326.44k £352.95k £354.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £58.64k
Income from government grants £30.47k £10.50k N/A N/A £2.37k