Trustees RSA ACADEMIES

Charity number: 1148908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Towers Chair 01 September 2018
RSA (THE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF ARTS, MANUFACTURES AND COMMERCE)
Received: On time
RACHEL SANDBY-THOMAS Trustee 11 May 2017
THE WHITEHALL AND INDUSTRY GROUP
Received: On time
FUTURE-FIT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Susan Hind-Woodward Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
PETER FELL Trustee 21 September 2015
PAIN RELIEF FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Penelope Egan Trustee 15 September 2014
THE CYRIL TAYLOR CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time