IMMIGRATION LAW PRACTITIONERS' ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1155286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HAZAR EL CHAMAA Chair 20 March 2013 None on record
Maria Gabriella Bettiga Trustee 24 November 2020 None on record
Sophie Barrett-Brown Trustee 23 November 2019 None on record
Julie Moktadir Trustee 23 November 2019 None on record
Andrea Als Trustee 15 January 2020
BRITISH FUTURE Received: On time
Helen Johnson Trustee 23 November 2019 None on record
David Ball Trustee 23 November 2019 None on record
Tanya Goldfarb Trustee 24 November 2020 None on record
AYESHA MOHSIN Trustee 20 March 2013 None on record
Enny Farhana Choudhury Trustee 24 November 2020 None on record
Grace McGill Trustee 28 November 2015 None on record