Financial history EMERGENCY-LIFE SUPPORT FOR CIVILIAN VICTIMS OF WAR AND POVERTY,UK

Charity number: 1148818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £473.90k £150.23k £169.46k £245.34k £262.27k
Total expenditure £78.81k £495.71k £143.90k £276.12k £180.15k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A