Accounts and annual returns QURAN AND SUNNAH ACADEMY LIMITED

Charity number: 1149918
Charity reporting is up to date (74 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2023 14 May 2024 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2023 14 May 2024 74 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2022 11 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2021 15 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2020 26 March 2021 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2019 Not Required