Financial history QURAN AND SUNNAH ACADEMY LIMITED

Charity number: 1149918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/05/2017 01/05/2018 01/05/2019 01/05/2020 01/05/2021
Total gross income £5.70k £8.40k £5.46k £8.06k £24.68k
Total expenditure £9.91k £8.10k £5.07k £8.23k £13.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A