Financial history THE HELEN RACHAEL MACKANESS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1151396
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £43.81k £39.04k £35.29k £29.13k £20.33k
Total expenditure £77.28k £226.95k £203.12k £189.25k £153.42k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A