Financial history THE COLLEGE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1149142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £21.93k £52.52k £52.46k £52.46k £52.46k
Total expenditure £30.85k £74.97k £72.12k £70.02k £67.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A