Accounts and annual returns THE COLLEGE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1149142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 14 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 14 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 14 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 14 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 13 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required