WOOLPIT FESTIVAL SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1149380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £14.57k £12.99k £11.35k £2.45k £9.87k
Total expenditure £12.29k £11.77k £10.49k £2.94k £11.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A