THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CHAD, HANDFORTH

Charity number: 1149381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £153.29k £204.83k £295.56k £206.87k £143.18k
Total expenditure £140.25k £214.88k £179.52k £194.23k £179.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £5.50k £0 N/A N/A