ONUA DO KUO

Charity number: 1148633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 17 April 2021 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 07 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 07 November 2019 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 04 April 2018 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 10 July 2017 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required