THE MADANI ACADEMY PORTSMOUTH LTD

Charity number: 1149317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £86.02k £96.64k £102.12k £90.70k £97.55k
Total expenditure £57.62k £77.69k £93.86k £90.63k £88.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A