Accounts and annual returns CHRISTCHURCH COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP LTD

Charity number: 1149162
Charity reporting is overdue by 136 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 136 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 136 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window