Financial history CHRISTCHURCH COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP LTD

Charity number: 1149162
Charity reporting is overdue by 139 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £53.44k £40.86k £83.15k £62.93k £58.91k
Total expenditure £47.25k £44.17k £53.46k £60.22k £62.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.56k N/A £500 N/A N/A