Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN PUDDLETOWN

Charity number: 1150071
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev SARAH CATHERINE HILLMAN Chair 02 December 2012
None on record
David Alexander Elliott Trustee 15 May 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DORCHESTER AND WEST STAFFORD
Received: On time
CHURCH INSTITUTE
Received: On time
CHURCH ESTATE
Received: On time
Peter John Bishop Trustee 17 April 2019
None on record
Cynthia Metcalf Trustee 17 March 2019
None on record
Roderick Hughes Trustee 17 March 2019
None on record
Pamela Fleetwood Trustee 17 March 2019
None on record
Dawn Loveless Trustee 17 March 2019
None on record
Patricia Sparks Trustee 17 March 2019
None on record
David Jeffreys Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
Robert Todd Trustee 02 December 2012
None on record
JEAN SUZANNE JEFFREYS Trustee 02 December 2012
None on record