THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN AND ST CHAD, BREWOOD

Charity number: 1148963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher David Gee Bywater Trustee 17 April 2016 None on record
DAVID HUNT Trustee 13 September 2012 None on record
Anthea Rosemary Taylor Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record
Kenneth John Ebbrell Trustee 05 September 2021 None on record
Rev Marilyn Judith Coulter Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record
ROBERT IAN HUNTER Trustee 30 April 2013 None on record
PETER BACHE Trustee 02 April 2017 None on record
Rev PHILIP MOON Chair 21 July 2016
BREWOOD PAROCHIAL CHARITIES Received: On time
MICHAEL JOHN EVANS Trustee 02 April 2017 None on record
Sheila Pickerell Trustee 26 May 2021 None on record
Robert Frank Short Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record
SHIRLEY JOAN SNOW Trustee 13 September 2012 None on record
Joanna Monckton Trustee 02 April 2017 None on record
MEGAN HILARY PITTWOOD Trustee 08 April 2018
SOUTH STAFFORDSHIRE WORK CLUBS Received: On time