THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN AND ST CHAD, BREWOOD

Charity number: 1148963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 May 2017 On time Download