THE DOXA PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 1149836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 30 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 08 January 2020 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 08 January 2020 39 days late Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 21 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 21 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 30 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2016 16 January 2017 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 16 January 2017 47 days late Download